THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghaffar-Sedeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghaffar-Sedeh (CPSO#: 81774 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghaffar-Sedeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghaffar-Sedeh (CPSO#: 81774 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM GHAFFAR-SEDEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFAR-SEDEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM GHAFFAR-SEDEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAFFAR-SEDEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2004