THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:16:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 1994
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Urology
01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Urology
25 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Urology
01 Jul 2004 to 24 Sep 2004
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 25 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 24 Sep 2004
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2004