THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:10:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Laboratory Medicine Program
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163403072
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 12 May 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blaise Alexander Clarke and Dr. Anna Marie Mulligan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Laboratory Medicine Program
University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St.
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163403072
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 12 May 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Blaise Alexander Clarke and Dr. Anna Marie Mulligan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 May 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 12 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Anna Marie Mulligan may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Anna Marie Mulligan may practise medicine independently in anatomical
pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 May 2017
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 May 2017

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 May 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2004