THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 01:38:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 212
245 Pelham Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-2207
Fax: (905) 682-1793

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 212
245 Pelham Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-2207
Fax: (905) 682-1793

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALA DAFI SALEEM SHAKHATREH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKHATREH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HALA DAFI SALEEM SHAKHATREH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKHATREH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004