THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:12:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058730111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058730111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHIR TAYYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYYEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHIR TAYYEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYYEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2004