THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:09:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room H429
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4742
Fax: (416) 480-6072
Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: (416) 469-6106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fuad Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Room H429
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4742
Fax: (416) 480-6072
Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: (416) 469-6106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fuad Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FUAD MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FUAD MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2004