THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:31:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Division of Hematology
800 Commissioners Road East
Rm E6 216 PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58833
Fax: (519) 685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mexico

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Division of Hematology
800 Commissioners Road East
Rm E6 216 PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 58833
Fax: (519) 685-8294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Mexico

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 07 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALEJANDRO LAZO LANGNER may practise medicine independently in hematology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALEJANDRO LAZO LANGNER may practise medicine independently in hematology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004