THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:44:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Doneck Medical University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9301 Bathurst St unit 8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-7472
Fax: (905) 918-0037

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Doneck Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9301 Bathurst St unit 8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-7472
Fax: (905) 918-0037

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GALINA GRIGORIEVNA PORTNOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTNOI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GALINA GRIGORIEVNA PORTNOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTNOI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Sep 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 Sep 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: Doneck Medical University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2004