THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:57:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Geriatric Health Care Sys
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Russian Federation

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Geriatric Health Care Sys
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-785-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Russian Federation

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Nov 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 24 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Helena Mikhailovna Senderovich may practise Family Medicine independently
limited to Geriatrics and Palliative Care.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Helena Mikhailovna Senderovich may practise Family Medicine independently
limited to Geriatrics and Palliative Care.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baskirian State Medical University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004