THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:58:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - Victoria Campus
Room B1-182
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8021
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 19 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bartley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - Victoria Campus
Room B1-182
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8021
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 19 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bartley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA LIANE BARTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBRA LIANE BARTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004