THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:47:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-897-9228
Fax: 905-897-7780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Jensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-897-9228
Fax: 905-897-7780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 23 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Jensen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004