THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:25:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 52009
Windsor Ontario N8X 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (888) 501-9188
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 26 May 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor, Ontario
N9C 3Z4
Tel: (519) 257-5184
Fax:(519) 257-5137
Date Received: 09 Aug 2012

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 52009
Windsor Ontario N8X 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (888) 501-9188
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 26 May 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Windsor Regional Hospital - Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor, Ontario
N9C 3Z4
Tel: (519) 257-5184
Fax:(519) 257-5137
Date Received: 09 Aug 2012

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DAVID BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRADLEY DAVID BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 May 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004