THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:55:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 12 May 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 12 May 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2004