THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:46:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, MARATHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 112
377 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 896-3777
Fax: (905) 896-7847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, MARATHI, URDU
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 112
377 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 896-3777
Fax: (905) 896-7847

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: West Park Healthcare Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHUBALI DHANANJAY LAGARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGARE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHUBALI DHANANJAY LAGARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGARE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2005