THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:26:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Still View Avenue
Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Extension: 1198
Fax: (514) 630-2080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Still View Avenue
Pointe Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Extension: 1198
Fax: (514) 630-2080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA DELLE DONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELLE DONNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA DELLE DONNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELLE DONNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Mar 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2005