THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:27:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Pediatrics
20 Feb 2006 to 03 Mar 2006
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatrics
14 Mar 2005 to 08 Apr 2005
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatrics
DATE: 20 Feb 2006 to 03 Mar 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatrics
DATE: 14 Mar 2005 to 08 Apr 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2005