THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:37:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-826-0775
Fax: 519-837-2167
Address: 50 charlton ave
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33856
Fax: (905) 521-6100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ALSHAKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-826-0775
Fax: 519-837-2167
Address: 50 charlton ave
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 33856
Fax: (905) 521-6100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ALSHAKMAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALAD M AL-SHAKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAKMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALAD M AL-SHAKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAKMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2005