THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:51:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Springbank Dr
Suite 202
London ON N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-913-3500
Fax: 519-913-3709

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Hunter-Orange Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Springbank Dr
Suite 202
London ON N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-913-3500
Fax: 519-913-3709

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Hunter-Orange Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA MARION HUNTER-ORANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER-ORANGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA MARION HUNTER-ORANGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTER-ORANGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005