THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:11:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: INST NATIONAL D'ENSEIGNEMENT SUPERIEUR, 1987
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bouazza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Mar 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: INST NATIONAL D'ENSEIGNEMENT SUPERIEUR, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bouazza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Mar 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DJAMEL BOUAZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUAZZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DJAMEL BOUAZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUAZZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: INST NATIONAL D'ENSEIGNEMENT SUPERIEUR, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2005