THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:57:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
Rm D2-160
268 Grosvenor St.
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-5986
Fax: (519) 646-6072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
Rm D2-160
268 Grosvenor St.
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-5986
Fax: (519) 646-6072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILLIAN DE JESUS JEREMIAS BARRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILLIAN DE JESUS JEREMIAS BARRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005