THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:55:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 236 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-0567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Bottoni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 236 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-0567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David A. Bottoni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY BOTTONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTTONI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY BOTTONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTTONI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005