THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
Box 70
106 Drynan Way
Seeleys Bay Ontario K0H 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 387-3120
Fax: (613) 387-2842
Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 1
Box 70
106 Drynan Way
Seeleys Bay Ontario K0H 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 387-3120
Fax: (613) 387-2842
Address: Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY MADELINE O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY MADELINE O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005