THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:58:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-1242
Fax: (416) 431-0836
Address: Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
40 Holly Street
Suite #301
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 416-486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 431-1242
Fax: (416) 431-0836
Address: Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
40 Holly Street
Suite #301
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C3
Phone: 416-486-8088
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL BRYAN ORZECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORZECH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL BRYAN ORZECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORZECH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005