THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 08:14:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 59 Marchvale Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2W 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-401-3155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, please contact:
Dr. Deepak Murthy
101 St. Joseph Street
Pembroke, ON
K8A 8C9
Phone: 613-732-6662
Date Received: 13 Jul 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uttley Rainville Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rainville (CPSO#: 82499 ) Dr. S. Uttley (CPSO#: 82583 )
Business Address: N113 - CFB Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K0J 1J0
(613) 687-5511
Business Address: 81S11-60 Moodie Dr
Nepean ON K1A 0K6
613-633-8821
Business Address: C-101 Joseph St
Pembroke ON K8A 8C9
613-732-6662

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 59 Marchvale Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2W 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-401-3155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical record requests, please contact:
Dr. Deepak Murthy
101 St. Joseph Street
Pembroke, ON
K8A 8C9
Phone: 613-732-6662
Date Received: 13 Jul 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uttley Rainville Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rainville (CPSO#: 82499 ) Dr. S. Uttley (CPSO#: 82583 )
Business Address: N113 - CFB Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K0J 1J0
(613) 687-5511
Business Address: 81S11-60 Moodie Dr
Nepean ON K1A 0K6
613-633-8821
Business Address: C-101 Joseph St
Pembroke ON K8A 8C9
613-732-6662

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN RICHARD UTTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTTLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN RICHARD UTTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTTLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005