THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:33:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Great Ormond Street
London WC1N 3JH
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +442074059200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Bartholomews Hospital
West Smithfield
London United Kingdom EC1A 7BE
Phone: +44 20 7377 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 21 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Great Ormond Street
London WC1N 3JH
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +442074059200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Bartholomews Hospital
West Smithfield
London United Kingdom EC1A 7BE
Phone: +44 20 7377 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 21 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUSHA JEGATHEESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEGATHEESWARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUSHA JEGATHEESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEGATHEESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005