THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Transitional Care Unit
1053 Carling Avenue, Floor E5
Ottawa Ontario K2Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137614526
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Brigham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Transitional Care Unit
1053 Carling Avenue, Floor E5
Ottawa Ontario K2Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137614526
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Brigham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH IRENE BRIGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH IRENE BRIGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005