THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:16:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18002676522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18002676522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deaton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHOSHANAH ELIANE CHARLOTTE DEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEATON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHOSHANAH ELIANE CHARLOTTE DEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEATON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005