THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 Columbia Street
Infectious Diseases Clinic
Royal Inland Hospital
Kamloops British Columbia V2C 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 250-374-5111
Fax: 250-314-2164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roth Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Roth (CPSO#: 86756 ) Dr. T. Liu (CPSO#: 82727 )
Business Address: 506 King St E
Cambridge ON N3H 3N2
(519) 277-4515
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Infectious Diseases Clinic
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4348
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Bouelvard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 29 Young Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2L4
(519) 603-0223

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311 Columbia Street
Infectious Diseases Clinic
Royal Inland Hospital
Kamloops British Columbia V2C 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 250-374-5111
Fax: 250-314-2164

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roth Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Roth (CPSO#: 86756 ) Dr. T. Liu (CPSO#: 82727 )
Business Address: 506 King St E
Cambridge ON N3H 3N2
(519) 277-4515
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2330
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Infectious Diseases Clinic
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4348
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Bouelvard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 29 Young Street East
Waterloo Ontario N2J 2L4
(519) 603-0223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESA TINA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESA TINA LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005