THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Cooper Clinic
2300 Princess St
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 531-2667
Fax: (613) 541-0744
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400
Fax: 613-541-0744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Cooper Clinic
2300 Princess St
Kingston Ontario K7M 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 531-2667
Fax: (613) 541-0744
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400
Fax: 613-541-0744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005