THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:09:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
DATE: 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005