THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:50:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Dundas Street East, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5460 Yonge Street, unit 204
North York Ontario M2N 6K7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2023

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Dundas Street East, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5B 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5460 Yonge Street, unit 204
North York Ontario M2N 6K7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2023

Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAGDEEP SINGH GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAGDEEP SINGH GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005