THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:57:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Boul Décarie
Royal Victoria Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases, Department of Medcine
Room E5-1820
Montréal QC H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5149341934
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1650 Av Cedar
McGill University Health Centre - Montreal General Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases, Department of Medicine
A5.156
Montréal QC H3G 1A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Boul Décarie
Royal Victoria Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases, Department of Medcine
Room E5-1820
Montréal QC H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5149341934
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1650 Av Cedar
McGill University Health Centre - Montreal General Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases, Department of Medicine
A5.156
Montréal QC H3G 1A4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TODD CAMPBELL LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TODD CAMPBELL LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Oct 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005