THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:46:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for
Palliative Care 4th Floor, Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mahtani (CPSO#: 82950 ) Dr. N. Parekh (CPSO#: 82968 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 289-0185

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre for
Palliative Care 4th Floor, Box 13
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Parekh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mahtani (CPSO#: 82950 ) Dr. N. Parekh (CPSO#: 82968 )
Business Address: 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 289-0185

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMONA MAHTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHTANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMONA MAHTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHTANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005