THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:21:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Coryn A. R. Hayman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Oct 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Coryn A. R. Hayman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Oct 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
16 Dec 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 16 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 16, 2020, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Coryn Allan Richard Hayman in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hayman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Hayman has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from December 16, 2020, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Coryn Allan Richard Hayman in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hayman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Hayman has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.




Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2005