THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Illinois, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akeem Anifowoshe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Illinois, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akeem Anifowoshe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 12 Nov 2014
Summary:
Summary:

Dr. Akeem Babatunde ANIFOWOSHE is not a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and is no longer registered with the College. An investigation has confirmed that Dr. ANIFOWOSHE obtained his certificate of registration by making false or misleading representations and declarations on or in connection with his application for a certificate of registration, by commission or omission, and is deemed thereafter not to have, and not to have had, the standards and qualifications for a certificate of any class, pursuant to the Medicine Act, 1991, O.Reg.865/93, s.2(4)

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 12 Nov 2014
Summary:
Summary:

Dr. Akeem Babatunde ANIFOWOSHE is not a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and is no longer registered with the College. An investigation has confirmed that Dr. ANIFOWOSHE obtained his certificate of registration by making false or misleading representations and declarations on or in connection with his application for a certificate of registration, by commission or omission, and is deemed thereafter not to have, and not to have had, the standards and qualifications for a certificate of any class, pursuant to the Medicine Act, 1991, O.Reg.865/93, s.2(4)

Training

Medical School: University of Illinois, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Nov 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005