THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:37:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tariq Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Dec 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tariq Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Dec 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Sep 2015
Summary of Decision:
On September 24, 2015, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Iqbal committed acts of professional misconduct in that, in respect of four patients, he has engaged in sexual abuse, he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Ms A
Regarding Ms A, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice in respect of Ms A by failing to ensure her privacy (failing to leave the room while dressing and not ensuring appropriate draping) by performing examinations in the prone position; by performing intimate examinations that were unnecessary and in the manner he performed the intimate examinations.

In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms A during an office visit in May 2011, by repeatedly and forcefully moving his finger(s) in and out of her rectum in a sexual manner and without changing gloves, moved directly to insert his fingers in her vagina and again moved them in and out in a sexual manner, under the guise of medical examinations.

Ms B
Regarding Ms B, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession by failing to respect the privacy of Ms B (failing to leave the room while dressing and assisting undressing), and by performing an unjustified examination in an inappropriate manner.

In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms B by penetrating her vagina with his finger and moving it in a sexual manner. Further, while performing a cortisone injection, Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms B by having a finger in her vagina and massaging the area without medical justification.

Ms C
Regarding Ms C, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practiceof the profession by failing to respect Ms C’s privacy, assisting her in removing her clothing, themanner and position he performed a perianal examination, and by inappropriately touching her vagina and clitoris during the examination.

In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms C on the office visit of June 2011 by touching her vagina and clitoris in a sexually stimulating manner under the guise of a medical examination.

Ms D
Regarding Ms D, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect of Ms D by not respecting her privacy when he remained in the room while she changed, and by performing inappropriate examinations of her vagina.

In addition, the Committee found Dr. Iqbal engaged in sexual abuse of Ms D in May 2011, by touching her lower vulva and separating her labia without clinical justification, and in June 2011, when he inserted his fingers into her rectum and vagina and moved them in a sexual manner under the guise of a medical examination.

The Committee found that Dr. Iqbal’s conduct with respect to these four patients, Ms A, Ms B, Ms C, and Ms D, would also reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.

On October 20, 2015, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar revoke Dr. Iqbal’s certificate of registration, effective immediately;
- Dr. Iqbal appear before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be fixed by the hearings office which shall be no later than six (6) months from the date this Order becomes final
- Dr. Iqbal reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts within sixty (60) days of the date this Order becomes final, in the amount of $64,240.00
- Dr. Iqbal pay costs to the College in the amount of $49,060.00 within sixty (60) days of the date this Order become final.

On November 17, 2015, Dr. Iqbal appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. In the circumstances of the case, the penalty remains in effect.

On December 3, 2015, Dr. Iqbal abandoned the appeal of the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): May 19-22, June 1-5, June 16, 2015. Penalty hearing date: October 20, 2015

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Sep 2015
Summary of Decision:
On September 24, 2015, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Iqbal committed acts of professional misconduct in that, in respect of four patients, he has engaged in sexual abuse, he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional and he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Ms A
Regarding Ms A, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice in respect of Ms A by failing to ensure her privacy (failing to leave the room while dressing and not ensuring appropriate draping) by performing examinations in the prone position; by performing intimate examinations that were unnecessary and in the manner he performed the intimate examinations.

In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms A during an office visit in May 2011, by repeatedly and forcefully moving his finger(s) in and out of her rectum in a sexual manner and without changing gloves, moved directly to insert his fingers in her vagina and again moved them in and out in a sexual manner, under the guise of medical examinations.

Ms B
Regarding Ms B, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession by failing to respect the privacy of Ms B (failing to leave the room while dressing and assisting undressing), and by performing an unjustified examination in an inappropriate manner.

In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms B by penetrating her vagina with his finger and moving it in a sexual manner. Further, while performing a cortisone injection, Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms B by having a finger in her vagina and massaging the area without medical justification.

Ms C
Regarding Ms C, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practiceof the profession by failing to respect Ms C’s privacy, assisting her in removing her clothing, themanner and position he performed a perianal examination, and by inappropriately touching her vagina and clitoris during the examination.

In addition, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal sexually abused Ms C on the office visit of June 2011 by touching her vagina and clitoris in a sexually stimulating manner under the guise of a medical examination.

Ms D
Regarding Ms D, the Committee found that Dr. Iqbal failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect of Ms D by not respecting her privacy when he remained in the room while she changed, and by performing inappropriate examinations of her vagina.

In addition, the Committee found Dr. Iqbal engaged in sexual abuse of Ms D in May 2011, by touching her lower vulva and separating her labia without clinical justification, and in June 2011, when he inserted his fingers into her rectum and vagina and moved them in a sexual manner under the guise of a medical examination.

The Committee found that Dr. Iqbal’s conduct with respect to these four patients, Ms A, Ms B, Ms C, and Ms D, would also reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.

On October 20, 2015, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar revoke Dr. Iqbal’s certificate of registration, effective immediately;
- Dr. Iqbal appear before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be fixed by the hearings office which shall be no later than six (6) months from the date this Order becomes final
- Dr. Iqbal reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts within sixty (60) days of the date this Order becomes final, in the amount of $64,240.00
- Dr. Iqbal pay costs to the College in the amount of $49,060.00 within sixty (60) days of the date this Order become final.

On November 17, 2015, Dr. Iqbal appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. In the circumstances of the case, the penalty remains in effect.

On December 3, 2015, Dr. Iqbal abandoned the appeal of the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): May 19-22, June 1-5, June 16, 2015. Penalty hearing date: October 20, 2015

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005