THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:11:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
Medi-Share G70 -339Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 4P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-8582333
Fax: 519-8583603

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asim Nimir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AKAN, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
Medi-Share G70 -339Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6C 4P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-8582333
Fax: 519-8583603

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asim Nimir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIM BABO NIMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASIM BABO NIMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Khartoum, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005