THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:29:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
29 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 29 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005