THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:03:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
3V2 Paediatric Ophthalmology Clinic
Department of Surgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73509
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kourosh Sabri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
3V2 Paediatric Ophthalmology Clinic
Department of Surgery
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73509
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kourosh Sabri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Aug 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 22 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KOUROSH SABRI may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KOUROSH SABRI may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005