THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 202B
6941 Derry Road West
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 636-1779
Fax: (905) 636-1781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Kiaira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 202B
6941 Derry Road West
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 636-1779
Fax: (905) 636-1781

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary Kiaira Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 May 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 07 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mary Kirigo Kiaira may practise medicine independently in Office Based
Paediatrics, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Mary Kirigo Kiaira may practise medicine independently in Office Based
Paediatrics, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005