THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NSHA Community Mental Health
2nd Floor, Cole Harbour Place
51 Forest Hills Parkway, Box 4
Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2W 6C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902-434-3263
Fax: 902-434-0181
Address: 36 Solutions Drive
True North Psychological Services
Suite 407
Halifax Nova Scotia B3S 1N2
Phone: 902-406-6734
Fax: 833-664-8013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: NSHA Community Mental Health
2nd Floor, Cole Harbour Place
51 Forest Hills Parkway, Box 4
Dartmouth Nova Scotia B2W 6C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 902-434-3263
Fax: 902-434-0181
Address: 36 Solutions Drive
True North Psychological Services
Suite 407
Halifax Nova Scotia B3S 1N2
Phone: 902-406-6734
Fax: 833-664-8013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELIZABETH HOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELIZABETH HOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005