THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Gurdwara road
Ottawa Ontario K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 714-9855
Fax: (613) 714-9857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Gurdwara road
Ottawa Ontario K2E 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 714-9855
Fax: (613) 714-9857

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YING TUNG SIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YING TUNG SIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005