THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Odessa Medical University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33344 King Rd
Abbotsford BC V2S 6J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-8517693
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Broadway Forensic Group
101-1090 W8th Acvenue
Vancouver British Columbia V6H 1C4
Phone: 604-733-5722
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Odessa Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33344 King Rd
Abbotsford BC V2S 6J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-8517693
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Broadway Forensic Group
101-1090 W8th Acvenue
Vancouver British Columbia V6H 1C4
Phone: 604-733-5722
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRIY KOLCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLCHAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRIY KOLCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLCHAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Odessa Medical University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2005