THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:40:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lighthouse Medical Imaging
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100 / 105
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-499-3559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bharatwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lighthouse Medical Imaging
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100 / 105
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-499-3559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bharatwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VEERA BHARATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VEERA BHARATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2005