THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:29:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402 - 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-368-6424
Fax: 416 840 7075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Cres S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Mar 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deron Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402 - 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-368-6424
Fax: 416 840 7075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Cres S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Mar 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deron Brown Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIN ALEXANDRA JABLONOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABLONOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIN ALEXANDRA JABLONOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABLONOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 May 2018
Summary:
Effective February 2, 2022, Dr. Karin Jablonowski has completed all components of the SCERP dated May 14, 2018.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 14 May 2018
Summary:
Effective February 2, 2022, Dr. Karin Jablonowski has completed all components of the SCERP dated May 14, 2018.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Nov 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2019
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2005