THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:01:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatal Perinatal
Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6341
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Feb 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatal Perinatal
Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6341
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Feb 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
04 Feb 2019
03 Feb 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 04 2019
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 03 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Amr Ibraheem El-Dosoky Mohamed El-Shahed may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. El-Shahed holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. El-Shahed no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. El-Shahed's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. El-Shahed's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on February 4, 2019. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on Feburary 3, 2026.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Amr Ibraheem El-Dosoky Mohamed El-Shahed may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in
which Dr. El-Shahed holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. El-Shahed no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. El-Shahed's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. El-Shahed's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on February 4, 2019. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on Feburary 3, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mansoura University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2005