THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Respirologists
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-2300
Fax: 416-431-2303
Address: 205-7099 Yonge St
MedSleep
Thornhill ON L3T 0H1
Phone: 905-709-9696
Fax: 905-709-9764
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Toronto Sleep Clinic
Suite 108
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
Phone: 416-293-3233
Fax: 416-293-0692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Respirologists
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-2300
Fax: 416-431-2303
Address: 205-7099 Yonge St
MedSleep
Thornhill ON L3T 0H1
Phone: 905-709-9696
Fax: 905-709-9764
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Toronto Sleep Clinic
Suite 108
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
Phone: 416-293-3233
Fax: 416-293-0692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUNG HOON CHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUNG HOON CHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2005