THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:48:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1720 Howard Avenue
400
269
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192566590
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1720 Howard Avenue
400
269
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192566590
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUFTAH ALI MUFTAH MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUFTAH ALI MUFTAH MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2005