THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:01:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Records Management Ltd. at 1-800-775-0093 (phone), 647-933-2904 (fax) or www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 25 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gert Van Rooyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Records Management Ltd. at 1-800-775-0093 (phone), 647-933-2904 (fax) or www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 25 Mar 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gert Van Rooyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2005