THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:19:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen L. Stillman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Dec 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 May 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen L. Stillman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Dec 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Nov 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Karen Lynn Stillman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 28, 2016:

Dr. Stillman was the subject of a College investigation into whether she engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in her obstetrics and gynecology practice. For health reasons, Dr. Stillman had previously ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions on August 26, 2014. During the investigation, Dr. Stillman has agreed that she cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services unless and until the College approves her return to the practice of medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Nov 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Karen Lynn Stillman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 28, 2016:

Dr. Stillman was the subject of a College investigation into whether she engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in her obstetrics and gynecology practice. For health reasons, Dr. Stillman had previously ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions on August 26, 2014. During the investigation, Dr. Stillman has agreed that she cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services unless and until the College approves her return to the practice of medicine.

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 28 Nov 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2005